MERSEYSIDE SOCIETY FOR DEAF PEOPLE

Charity number: 1065021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £830.31k £865.82k £884.22k £997.52k £818.13k
Total expenditure £680.46k £778.17k £829.82k £890.68k £804.51k
Income from government contracts £748.21k £724.56k £792.81k £425.96k £436.10k
Income from government grants £3.00k £3.00k £6.00k £900 £3.11k
Income - Donations and legacies £28.11k £119.48k £31.49k £20.27k £48.99k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £748.21k £724.56k £792.81k £917.35k £728.08k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.39k £21.78k £59.92k £59.90k £41.06k
Income - Other £50.60k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £114.78k £0 £4.52k £5.01k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £680.46k £766.96k £829.82k £543.80k £804.51k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £346.88k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £20.74k £0 £9.76k £22.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £73.88k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £11.21k £0 £0 £0