Accounts and annual returns THE ROMNEY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1067208
Charity reporting is overdue by 265 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 265 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 265 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 November 2023 370 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2022 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required