Financial history THE ROMNEY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1067208
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.11k £6.48k £4.22k £4.24k £2.00k
Total expenditure £6.39k £5.09k £6.69k £5.45k £2.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A