EAST LONDON COMMUNITY LAW SERVICE

Charity number: 1064266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £52.83k £70.20k £86.60k £91.22k £63.69k
Total expenditure £53.10k £56.93k £69.85k £86.37k £38.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £23.63k