The Siamese Cat Welfare Trust

Charity number: 1072366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £180.51k £17.99k £40.70k £23.63k £34.98k
Total expenditure £16.08k £52.45k £15.35k £35.53k £24.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A