Financial history HOUNSLOW ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1065060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £67.84k £68.41k £50.91k £57.50k £51.22k
Total expenditure £57.02k £55.92k £39.59k £54.01k £42.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A