Trustees HOUNSLOW ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1065060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Lucius Covell Chair 25 June 2014
None on record
Sarah Louise Sutton Trustee 23 November 2021
None on record
Marijn Cecile van de Geer Trustee 23 November 2021
None on record
Heather Jane Walton Trustee 30 October 2019
None on record
Carol Willingham Trustee 21 November 2018
None on record
JOANNA ISMAIL Trustee 30 October 2013
None on record
CAROL JEAN ATKINSON Trustee
None on record
ROZ HAYWARD-BUTT Trustee
None on record