Dogfen lywodraethu ADVOCACY FOR ALL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/09/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE RELIEF OF VULNERABLE PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, PRIMARILY THOSE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES IN AND AROUND THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF BROMLEY AND BEXLEY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE RECRUITMENT TRAINING AND SUBSEQUENT PROVISION OF INDIVIDUALS AS ADVOCATES TO HELP SUCH PERSONS BY PROVIDING GENERIC ADVOCACY.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGHS OF BROMLEY AND BEXLEY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.