Financial history ST PAULS YOUTH ENSEMBLE

Charity number: 1067834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £11.27k £9.78k £10.22k £10.19k £1.92k
Total expenditure £8.49k £10.49k £9.89k £8.54k £3.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A