Financial history 1ST EFFINGHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1064632
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.21k £8.68k £11.30k £9.43k £27.21k
Total expenditure £10.45k £11.28k £11.75k £11.61k £8.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £20.19k