THE FORD MADOX FORD SOCIETY

Charity number: 1084040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £891 £569 £551 £494 £569
Total expenditure £2.62k £68 £1.83k £10 £178
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A