HOLBROOK HIGH SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1064605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £0 £1.20k £0 £889 £1.40k
Total expenditure £107 £113 £1.49k £963 £1.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A