MICHAEL ROBERTS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1065006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 August 2016 On time Download