Financial history ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY - ROYAL TUNBRIDGE WELLS BRANCH

Charity number: 1065173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £6.61k £5.74k £6.54k £3.73k £265
Total expenditure £6.16k £8.42k £6.15k £3.78k £110
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A