Accounts and annual returns OXFORD CONCERTO ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1064982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 July 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 October 2019 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required