Financial history THE JOHN HOWARD & DENISE FRANCES MERRY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1071873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £11.00k £10.65k £11.65k £10.46k £6.83k
Total expenditure £19.70k £19.21k £19.71k £19.64k £15.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A