ANIMALS IN NEED NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity number: 1068222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 19 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 05 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 05 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 11 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 11 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 31 July 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 July 2017 1 days late Download