THE VICTORY HALL, HASKETON

Charity number: 1071129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.43k £9.49k £9.07k £9.58k £9.51k
Total expenditure £14.53k £10.17k £6.00k £6.45k £6.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A