ORIENT REGENERATION

Charity number: 1066883
Charity is insolvent
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £2.40m £2.04m £1.72m £1.42m £1.34m
Total expenditure £2.64m £2.11m £1.98m £1.92m £1.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £10.25k £20.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £1.95m £1.52m £1.21m £1.21m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £89.27k £191.31k £185.93k £132.76k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.99m £1.86m £1.83m £1.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £54.88k £53.46k £61.40k £62.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £30.75k £33.58k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0