Financial history GUIDE ASSOCIATION LOUGHBOROUGH DIVISION

Charity number: 1068086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £13.35k £8.59k £12.06k £1.48k £2.23k
Total expenditure £11.79k £12.54k £11.37k £591 £1.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A