Financial history JULIA'S HOUSE LIMITED

Charity number: 1067125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.00m £7.38m £7.17m £10.06m £8.90m
Total expenditure £6.34m £7.25m £7.99m £7.13m £7.40m
Income from government contracts £308.18k £286.38k £293.87k £344.75k £265.40k
Income from government grants £90.56k £90.56k £98.80k £148.19k £595.86k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.73m £3.89m £3.50m £4.79m £3.27m
Income - Other trading activities £2.87m £3.10m £3.27m £2.07m £2.94m
Income - Charitable activities £398.75k £376.94k £392.66k £492.94k £861.26k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.52k £9.73k £13.72k £3.30k £3.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.70m £1.83m
Income - Legacies £1.36m £1.84m £1.52m £2.92m £1.67m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.78m £4.31m £4.60m £4.27m £4.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.23m £1.42m £1.61m £1.19m £1.23m
Expenditure - Governance £13.31k £17.65k £19.62k £19.10k £26.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £14.47k £15.12k £18.52k £19.75k £26.13k
Expenditure - Other £1.33m £1.52m £1.77m £1.67m £1.95m