Trustees THE HARPUR TRUST
Charity number: 1066861
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH MURRAY STEWART | Chair | 20 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Robert Rigby | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrea Clare Spice | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
William John Holland-Kaye | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Wilson Mr | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Harris | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Fordham | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wheeler | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK TAYLOR | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GEORGE RATCLIFFE | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Harriett Mather | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINBERT SPENCER | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
RHIAN CASTELL | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNE EGAN | Trustee | 31 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JENNIFER SARASWATHI SAUBOORAH TILL | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR STEPHEN MAYSON | Trustee | 20 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ANDREW JUSTIN PHILLIMORE | Trustee | 20 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.