FRIENDS OF ST TERESA'S

Charity number: 1067962
Charity reporting is overdue by 444 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £3.76k £3.86k £5.23k £5.62k £11.82k
Total expenditure £2.36k £3.87k £8.21k £4.65k £10.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0