Financial history Tanfield Railway Trust Limited

Charity number: 1072449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £21.91k £21.91k £38.57k £72.54k £58.29k
Total expenditure £14.08k £17.20k £10.51k £15.77k £65.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £32.78k £40.42k