QUAKER INTERNATIONAL EDUCATIONAL TRUST (QUIET)

Charity number: 1072250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £5.71m £6.70m £6.70m £7.19m £4.84m
Total expenditure £4.86m £5.75m £6.09m £6.69m £5.90m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £111.68k £124.81k £116.85k £102.00k £120.33k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.30m £6.18m £6.06m £6.55m £3.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £281.32k £395.40k £509.58k £529.72k £811.74k
Income - Other £11.76k £12.84k £15.60k £12.33k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £124.81k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.86m £5.75m £6.09m £6.69m £5.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £26.27k £29.76k £0 £28.37k £29.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £32.52k £0 £59.26k £0 £53.08k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0