QUAKER INTERNATIONAL EDUCATIONAL TRUST (QUIET)

Charity number: 1072250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Antoine Wakim Trustee 19 November 2021 None on record
JOHN CROSFIELD Trustee 01 February 2018
MID THAMES AREA QUAKER MEETING AND RELATED CHARITIES Received: On time
David F Hickok Trustee 01 July 2016 None on record
Khater Abi Habib Trustee 01 March 2020 None on record
Averil Armstrong Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
William David Adams Haire Trustee 01 July 2015 None on record
Rajit Gholap Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
Marie-Christine Mojabber Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
Antonios Manasseh Trustee 01 January 2021 None on record
PAUL HIGH Chair 01 July 2015
JOHN HORNIMAN'S CHILDREN'S TRUST Received: On time