BEAUFORT COTTAGE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1079834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.34k £156.13k £55.08k £90.16k £92.39k
Total expenditure £62.37k £59.42k £61.36k £77.05k £108.69k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A