WOMBOURNE AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1067808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required