THE FRIENDS OF ST. THOMAS MORE (LEICESTER)

Charity number: 1075467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/10/2016 01/10/2017 01/10/2018 01/10/2019 01/10/2020
Total gross income £12.05k £12.65k £11.72k £9.19k £4.42k
Total expenditure £8.97k £10.27k £6.86k £11.57k £8.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A