Accounts and annual returns NEW SPRINGS UK

Charity number: 1068899
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window