Financial history NEW SPRINGS UK

Charity number: 1068899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £340.69k £305.25k £359.37k £328.57k £409.57k
Total expenditure £248.30k £263.58k £338.22k £314.50k £288.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £43.58k