THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S OLD NEWTON

Charity number: 1068220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.18k £1.56k £2.47k £1.97k £2.42k
Total expenditure £2.45k £3.67k £2.27k £280 £3.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A