Financial history MANCHESTER AIRPORT COMMUNITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1071703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £129.37k £128.41k £145.65k £128.84k £126.38k
Total expenditure £116.03k £119.62k £157.25k £150.86k £133.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A