Dogfen lywodraethu MIND BLMK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/10/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/04/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AND ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF PEOPLE WITH MENTAL ILL HEALTH BY PROVISIONS OF SUPPORT, ADVICE AND OTHER SERVICES
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.