Financial history Citizens Advice in East Dorset and Purbeck Ltd

Charity number: 1068414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £215.06k £270.40k £250.35k £317.91k £936.48k
Total expenditure £206.62k £230.89k £235.57k £292.94k £889.72k
Income from government contracts £15.30k £93.68k N/A £97.33k £413.57k
Income from government grants £63.93k £93.68k £103.99k £4.32k £76.50k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £609
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £934.85k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.02k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £889.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £514
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0