Trustees Citizens Advice in East Dorset and Purbeck Ltd

Charity number: 1068414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michelle Fuller Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
Carole Anne Chedgy Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
JOHN RYNNE Trustee 01 April 2021
EAST DORSET CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Received: On time
Alan Breakwell Trustee 01 April 2021
EAST DORSET CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE TIVOLI
Received: On time
CITIZENS ADVICE IN DORSET
Received: On time
ASHLEY ROWLANDS Trustee 01 April 2021
EAST DORSET CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Received: On time
Chris Morle Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Barbara Manuel Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Ginette Boyd Trustee 02 October 2019
None on record
Timothy Smith Trustee 30 September 2015
None on record
Richard Holman Trustee 11 March 2014
CITIZENS ADVICE IN DORSET
Received: On time
STEPHEN NOEL PARKER Trustee 12 November 2013
CITIZENS ADVICE IN DORSET
Received: On time