1ST CREIGIAU SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1068401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required