1ST CREIGIAU SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1068401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £21.49k £21.01k £21.20k £29.14k £22.79k
Total expenditure £17.53k £14.92k £14.20k £33.80k £32.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k