ROCK HOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1068343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 September 2020 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 May 2020 107 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 November 2019 286 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 February 2017 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download