ROCK HOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1068343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £37.23k £39.09k £29.50k £25.65k £29.99k
Total expenditure £59.82k £70.58k £77.87k £46.42k £41.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A