ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION LETCHWORTH AND HITCHIN BRANCH

Charity number: 1068810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.85k £5.22k £10.46k £7.63k £2.46k
Total expenditure £5.71k £4.17k £12.05k £8.28k £3.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A