FRIENDS OF ST MARY AND ST PAUL'S CE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1072550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.73k £2.45k £3.09k £2.74k £2.79k
Total expenditure £989 £841 £834 £686 £431
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A