SHOREDITCH TOWN HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1069617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.81m £1.61m £1.12m £936.09k £1.36m
Total expenditure £1.72m £1.55m £1.30m £953.22k £1.13m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £3.47k N/A £4.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £75 £45 £0 £28 £0
Income - Other trading activities £734.52k £948.35k £988.02k £820.85k £1.05m
Income - Charitable activities £1.06m £648.71k £128.90k £100.66k £289.23k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £583 £514 £79 £100 £793
Income - Other £7.03k £10.80k £5.40k £14.45k £13.29k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.64m £1.30m £1.08m £909.19k £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £81.46k £245.64k £222.19k £44.03k £60.93k
Expenditure - Governance £6.82k £9.77k £9.87k £9.87k £9.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0