AFRICA GOODWILL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1074753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.05k £9.01k £8.75k £8.12k £8.02k
Total expenditure £8.90k £8.85k £8.58k £7.98k £7.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A