AFRICA GOODWILL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1074753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEVEN OTIM AMENY Trustee 24 November 2014 None on record
JOHN NAGILLAH Trustee 26 May 2013 None on record
RICHARD AMENY Trustee
AFRICAN CARE & DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: On time
REBECCA ADONG Trustee 20 June 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR OJOK ISAAC NEWTON Trustee None on record
REECE WARREN JORDAN CLOHESSY Trustee 12 August 2013 None on record
FRANCIS KWAME GAWU Trustee None on record
NOMSA GATSI Trustee None on record
FREDERICK BOKWA Trustee 30 March 2016 None on record