WEST MERCIA POLICE WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 1087525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2019 237 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 September 2019 237 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 May 2018 111 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 May 2017 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 06 March 2017 34 days late Download