WEST MERCIA POLICE WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 1087525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £147.45k £167.16k £192.07k £182.51k £176.86k
Total expenditure £193.26k £171.95k £164.59k £160.75k £169.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A