THE FOOTBALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1079309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEMIMA CHLOE BIRD Trustee 11 July 2018 None on record
Mark William Bullingham Trustee 18 September 2019 None on record
William Bush Trustee 25 February 2019 None on record
MARTIN GLENN Chair 01 January 2020
THE MERCURY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Elena Katherine Narozanski Trustee 04 March 2021 None on record
JOHN DAVID PEARCE Trustee 27 February 2018 None on record
Karen Taylor Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Tim Hollingsworth Trustee 11 December 2018 None on record
PETER MCCORMICK OBE Trustee None on record