ARCH UNDER THE BRIDGE LIMITED

Charity number: 1072568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £27.05k £16.38k £30.62k £13.22k £31.34k
Total expenditure £27.05k £16.38k £30.62k £13.22k £31.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.83k £10.50k £13.57k £12.60k £21.18k