Accounts and annual returns HARVEST FIELDS HOMES

Charity number: 1071686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window